HI HB498 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 202, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Broadens the scope of the Early Learning Program to include early childhood development. Expands the function of the Early Learning Board beyond an advisory capacity and amends the composition and powers of some board members. Allows the Early Learning Board to appoint the director of the Executive Office on Early Learning. (HB498 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Early Learning.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 202, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
2017-07-12SenateAct 202, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 170).
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 170) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, LoPresti, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; K. Kahele.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, LoPresti Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 576) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07SenateOne Day Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai.
2017-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 100).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
2017-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 715) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-15HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
2017-02-10HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
2017-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-23HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB687 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback