HI HB497 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 12:00 pm in Conference Room 308 Via Videoconference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the counties from requiring, as part of a county zoning ordinance or county rule, a developer with more than one residential unit to obtain the approval of any state agency unless that approval is expressly required by law. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To County Zoning Ordinances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden, McKelvey, Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB567 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback