HI HB494 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB494
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for administrative rules in the adoption process of the state building codes.
Title
Relating To The State Building Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB494 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB147 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
SB147 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Adoption Procedures
Amendments
Building Codes
Department of Accounting and General Services
State Fire Council Package
Amendments
Building Codes
Department of Accounting and General Services
State Fire Council Package
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=494&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB494_.HTM |