HI HB483 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 177, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Effective 1/1/2020, incorporates federal law regarding social groups and youth services organizations, same-sex living facilities, and sex-restricted scholarships and other forms of financial assistance into Act 110, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018. Extends the deadline for the legislative reference bureau to complete the study requested by Act 110 on existing federal Title IX enforcement practices and procedures on the federal level and in other jurisdictions. Requires the legislative reference bureau to make a report to the legislature no later than 8/1/2019. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Civil Rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateAct 177, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
2019-07-05HouseAct 177, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 876).
2019-04-26HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-26HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Moriwaki, Fevella.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Cullen, C. Lee, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 743) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-13SenateRe-Referred to GVO, JDC.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 381).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Belatti.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1042 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback