HI HB481 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to AGL/THA/PSM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to AGL/THA/PSM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the construction of certain indigenous Hawaiian hale on land that is used for farming operations without a building permit. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB481 HD1)
Title
Agricultural Land Use; Exemption; Indigenous Hawaiian Hale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AGL/THA/PSM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 222). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola. |
2013-02-01 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 8:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |