HI HB477 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB477
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Homeownership Housing Revolving Fund within HHFDC to provide loans to nonprofit housing development organizations and community development financial institutions for the development of affordable homeownership housing projects under a self-help housing program. Establishes the qualified nonprofit housing trust program to authorize HHFDC to provide loans to qualified nonprofit housing trusts and nonprofit community development financial institutions to develop affordable housing units. Makes an appropriation into and out of the qualified nonprofit housing trust revolving fund. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423. |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:00PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:32PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:10PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:10PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, San Buenaventura, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 742) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1976) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 51). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 629) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HSH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB477 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
Subjects
Affordable Homeownership
Appropriation ($)
HHFDC
Housing
Qualified Nonprofit Housing Trust Revolving Fund
Appropriation ($)
HHFDC
Housing
Qualified Nonprofit Housing Trust Revolving Fund