HI HB475 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes temporary tax credit for manufacturing and export industries. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Corinne W.L. Ching [R] | Rep. George Fontaine [R] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] |
Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Pine. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-11 11:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-15-11. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-08-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |