HI HB466 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB466
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to establish a grant program to assist persons who use albizia trees to create usable commercial products or are developing ways to use albizia trees to create usable products. Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, in consultation with certain academic units of the University of Hawaii, to study economically feasible ways in which businesses may use albizia trees to produce usable commercial products, including housing, throughout the State. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Albizia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-01-23 10:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to ECD, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1193 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB466 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-01-23 10:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
HB466 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-01-23 10:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=466&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB466_.HTM |