HI HB46 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. Nos. 1388 and 1401).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. Nos. 1388 and 1401).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in and around public housing projects or state low-income housing projects under the jurisdiction of the Hawaii public housing authority, with an exception for designated smoking areas. Allows for eviction upon a third violation of the smoking prohibition. (SD2)
Title
Public Housing; Low-income Housing; Smoking Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. Nos. 1388 and 1401). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1388 and 1401). | |
2012-06-25 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-12 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253) | |
2012-06-25 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1253) | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 681). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 675). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12 | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 667). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 753). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Green. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ito, Pine. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 507) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ryan, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3318) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-02 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2957) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-21-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-12 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 18). | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, M. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Thielen excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 02-21-12. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Coffman. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-07-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-09-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB908 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.