HI HB454 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends income tax credit for low-income household renters to adjust for inflation. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2015.
Title
Women's Legislative Caucus Package; Income Tax Credit; Low-Income Household Renters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB392 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=454&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB454_.HTM |