HI HB449 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes under state law the growing, processing, possession, transfer, and personal use of marijuana in a specified quantity to persons at least twenty-one years of age. Requires licensing to operate marijuana establishments. Specifies the application and non-application of the Internal Revenue Code to expenses related to the production and sale of marijuana and marijuana products for state income tax purposes. Specifies that amounts received for the sale of marijuana or marijuana products are not exempt from the state general excise tax. Establishes a tax on the sale of marijuana, marijuana products, and manufactured marijuana products. Establishes an education special fund, into which marijuana tax revenues are to be deposited.
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB449 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=449&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB449_.HTM |