HI HB447 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Molokini special fund. Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to require commercial operators who conduct activities within the Molokini shoal to charge a user fee for each customer. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Aquatic Resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25HouseThe committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-25-19 10:35AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback