HI HB446 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 1:00 pm in Conference Room 308 Via Videoconference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a new offense of theft of a catalytic converter. Requires vehicle registration records to be kept for businesses engaged in the selling or negotiating the purchase of used motor vehicle parts or accessories or licensed to wreck, salvage, or dismantle motor vehicles. Requires these businesses to refuse purchase of used motor vehicle parts or accessories and report the attempted sale to police if a seller does not provide certain information. Changes the fine for any violations of the used motor vehicle parts and accessories laws. Regulates the purchase of catalytic converters and catalytic converter metals by scrap dealers. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB55 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - Referred to CPN, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback