HI HB446 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of condominium replacement reserve funds for emergency preparedness purposes.
Title
Condominium Replacement Reserves; Emergency Preparedness
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-12-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBS, CPC, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=446&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB446_.HTM |