HI HB442 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB442

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DLNR to develop a plan to reduce the disposition of public lands for military activities and make recommendations regarding the remediation and restoration of public lands that have been damaged by military use. Requires DLNR to convene an advisory committee to provide recommendations regarding the plan. Requires reports to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CMV, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB442 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback