HI HB442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish two part-time project-based research archivist positions in the Hawaii state archives to provide research services and digitization of records. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-10 | House | Re-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2020-02-10 | House | Recommitted to WLH as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Gates excused. |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to WLH for further consideration. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB442 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH, referral sheet 3