HI HB440 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires enforcement of bonds for mechanics' and materialmen's liens within three months of its posting.
Title
Mechanics' and Materialmen's Liens; Discharge by Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-10-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=440 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB440_.HTM |