HI HB408 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates registry of felony animal abusers and authorizes public access to the registry. Establishes the violation of registration requirements as a class C felony. Effective 1/1/2014.
Title
Animal Abuse; Registry ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-08-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB528 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=408&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB408_.HTM |