HI HB399 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain private employers to allow employees to take paid leaves of absence for organ, bone marrow, or peripheral blood stem cell donation. Requires employers to restore an employee returning from leave to the same or equivalent position. Establishes a private right of action for employees seeking enforcement of provisions. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Employment; Leave of Absence; Organ, Bone Marrow, or Peripheral Blood Stem Cell Donation
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2013-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-13 1:15PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Nishihara. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takumi, Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to EDN, HLT, LAB, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 599) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 12 offered. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-13 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/JDL. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/EDU, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH/EDU. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 212). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, Hashem, Ito, McDermott voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Ichiyama. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |