HI HB389 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB389
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires accredited and non-accredited for-profit post-secondary educational institutions that are authorized to award degrees and operate in the State to disclose on the institution's official website, promotional digital and print media, and contracts for instruction, that they are for-profit businesses. Effective 7/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Post-secondary Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HRE, CPN/WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 216). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB389 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.