HI HB389 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from $5 to $10 the amount of authorized income tax check-off that may be designated payable from an individual's state income tax refund to certain special funds or accounts. Permits designation of check-off in the amount of $5 or $10 to the special funds or accounts specified. Effective 7/01/2030. (HD1)
Title
Income Tax; Check-off
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 27). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami excused (5). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 581) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |