HI HB385 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the minimum age in which one can purchase any tobacco product or electronic smoking device from 18 to 21 years of age. Prohibits the sale or furnishing of tobacco, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices to persons under 21 years of age. (HB385 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Smoking Devices; Tobacco; Cigarettes; Minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19SenateThe recommendation was not adopted.
2015-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2015-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kidani.
2015-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2015-03-10SenateReferred to HTH/CPN, JDL.
2015-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 12).
2015-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Keohokalole, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ohno voting no (2) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2015-03-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2015-02-24HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2015-02-23HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2015-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2015-02-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
2015-02-20HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 453) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2015-02-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola.
2015-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2015-01-26HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 1
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2015-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback