HI HB382 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Act 070, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Act 070, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2023 and ending 6/30/2025. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Act 070, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2023-06-07 | House | Act 070, on 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 202). |
2023-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Dela Cruz, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Yamashita, Kitagawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Takayama, Souza. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Awa. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 883) in amended form (SD 3). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Ihara, Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-23 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report filed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 6 offered. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1844) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 461). |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Kobayashi, Kong, Perruso excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-13 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 03-15-23. |
2023-03-13 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-08-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-10-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB482 (Same As) 2023-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.