HI HB382 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to report suspected financial abuse of an elder to an appropriate police department and allows reporting to the Department of Human Services. Mandates information sharing with the police or prosecutor.
Title
Financial Abuse; Elderly; Mandatory Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=382&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB382_.HTM |