HI HB381 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - (H) Act 043, on 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - (H) Act 043, on 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes for the purpose of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting unnecessary provisions. (SD1)
Title
Revision Bill
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | (H) Act 043, on 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Act 043, 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 653). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Thielen excused (2). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 585). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 456) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 94). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Morita. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The votes in JUD were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Morita. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on Tuesday, 02-08-11. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by JUD on Wednesday, 03-02-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-08-11 2:00PM in House conference room Auditorium. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |