HI HB376 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB376

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows purchasing agencies to award a contract to the second lowest bidder in certain cases through the competitive sealed bidding process. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21.
2021-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference.
2021-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB658 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB376 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback