HI HB369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the allocation of funds from transient accommodations tax revenue to the special land and development fund to improve certain state resources and services. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1). |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB644 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB369 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1).
HB369 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1).