HI HB361 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB361
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-02 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-02 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 11/1/2022, prohibits the governor and each county mayor, while holding those offices, to maintain any other employment, maintain a controlling interest in a business, or receive any emolument, beginning on the sixty-first calendar day after their election or appointment to office. Effective 7/1/2020. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Emoluments.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 380). |
2020-07-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2020-07-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 377). |
2020-07-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-06-20. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 354). |
2020-03-06 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-03-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 525) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-20. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3399) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-04-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 01-28-20 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-14-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD , referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB361 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.