HI HB359 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the OVS to make burial grant payments for burial costs and for transportation to the Philippines of the remains of a deceased veteran who joined the New Filipino Scouts between 10/06/1945 and 06/30/1947 and died after 06/30/2004. Appropriates funds.
Title
Veterans Cemetery; Filipino Veterans; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by INT on Monday, 01-31-11 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to INT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=359 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB359_.HTM |