HI HB33 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a landlord, when processing an application to rent residential property to charge an application screening fee for the actual costs of screening the applicant, plus an additional administrative fee. Requires landlords to refund any unused amount of the application screening fee and provide a copy of any report obtained via the screening process to the applicant. (HB33 HD1)
Title
Residential Landlord-Tenant Code; Application Screening Fee; Tenant Report; Consumer Credit Report
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |