HI HB322 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB322
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an income tax credit to incentivize the food manufacturing industry in the State. Applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Title
Relating To Manufacturing.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB497 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB322 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB322 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=322&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB322_.HTM |