HI HB314 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new chapter to regulate the use of unmanned aerial vehicles. Establishes prohibited uses of unmanned aerial vehicles for individuals, law enforcement agencies, and public agencies. Provides certain exceptions for the use of unmanned aerial vehicles. Makes certain uses of an unmanned aerial vehicle a petty misdemeanor and misdemeanor and Class C felony for a second of subsequent violations. Establishes a task force. (HB314 HD1)
Title
Relating To Unmanned Aerial Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 251). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:01PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-24 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-17. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-22-17. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17, 2:00 PM room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-31-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB314 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.