HI HB310 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a nonvoting county representative to participate in collective bargaining negotiations for county employees. Reduces the number of votes the governor has from 4 to 1 for negotiations involving police officers and firefighters. Requires the respective Mayor to provide timely collective bargaining negotiation updates to the applicable county council.
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB310 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package
Mayors
Nonvoting Representative
Counties
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package
Mayors
Nonvoting Representative
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=310&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB310_.HTM |