HI HB305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Transportation to establish a Community Crosswalks Pilot Program to design and implement specially painted crosswalks in neighborhoods. Appropriates funds for the pilot program. Creates a Community Crosswalks Pilot Program Special Fund. (HB305 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Crosswalks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateThe committee on TRS deferred the measure.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-20-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 27).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback