HI HB304 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a vehicle to allow more time to a defaulting mortgagor facing foreclosure. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB304 HD1)
Title
Foreclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ito, Karamatsu, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-01-10 2:00 pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |