HI HB299 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the payment priority of the DNA analysis fee over other fees and fines assessed against a defendant by the court. (HB299 HD1)
Title
DNA Analysis Fee; Priority of Payment
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-10-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |