HI HB298 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - (H) Act 042, on 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - (H) Act 042, on 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts court interpreters who appear at the request of the circuit court, family court, or district court from parking violations for expired meters. (SD1)
Title
Court Interpreters; Parking Violation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | (H) Act 042, on 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142). | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Act 042, 5/4/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 653). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Thielen excused (2). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 585). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 444) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. | |
2011-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14). | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Say, Takai excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Morita, Souki. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-11-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |