HI HB293 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution to repeal the exclusive power of the counties to exercise the functions, powers, and duties related to real property taxation, thereby authorizing the State to also exercise those functions, powers, and duties.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Viii, Section 3 Of The Hawaii Constitution Relating To The Functions, Powers, And Duties Of Real Property Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to ECD/LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB293 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to ECD/LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=293&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB293_.HTM |