HI HB293 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to TEC.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to TEC.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and designates Flavobacterium akiainvivens as the official microbe of the State. (HB293 HD1)
Title
State Microbe
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TEC. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 142). |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |