HI HB291 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes exclusive jurisdiction of the Small Claims Division of the District Court over cases in which the amount claimed is $1,000 or less. Expands the Small Claims Division's jurisdiction over personal property cases to include any personal property worth $5,000 or less. (HB291 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judiciary Package; Small Claims Division of the District Court; Jurisdiction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2015-02-10HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2015-02-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, McDermott.
2015-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2015-01-26HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2015-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB430 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback