HI HB2897 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - (H) Act 185, on 6/30/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 407).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - (H) Act 185, on 6/30/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 407).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects a contractor to revocation, suspension, or nonrenewal of its license for knowingly or intentionally employing a person on any project or operation who is not eligible to work in the United States under federal law. (SD1)
Title
Contractor License; Revocation or Suspension; Illegal Worker
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | (H) Act 185, on 6/30/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 407). | |
2010-06-30 | (S) Act 185, 6/30/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 646). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 598). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Takai excused (2). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 586). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-10 | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 582). | |
2010-04-16 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Rhoads, Herkes, Karamatsu (Co-)Chairman; Pine. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 575). | |
2010-04-15 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Herkes, Karamatsu Co-Chairs; Souki, Pine. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Baker, Taniguchi, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 481) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2995) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 03-23-10 at 9:30 am in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from LBR/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2800) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Bunda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-10 3:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to LBR/CPN, JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 155). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 464-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Herkes, Morita. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-23-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no and none excused. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 290-10), recommending referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Morita. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-10 2:00 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-10 9:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Referred to LAB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 9 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB2925 (Same As) 2010-01-29 - (S) Referred to LBR/JGO, CPN.