HI HB289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from taxation one hundred per cent of the gain realized by a fee simple owner from the sale of a leased fee interest in units within a condominium project, cooperative project, or planned unit development to the association of apartment owners or the residential cooperative housing corporation of the leasehold units. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020 and ending prior to 1/1/2028.
Title
Relating To Leasehold Conversion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB289 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=289&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB289_.HTM |