HI HB2800 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily prohibits the department of transportation from assessing landing fees upon air carriers for flights landing at Molokai Airport, Lanai Airport, Kapalua-West Maui Airport, Hana Airport, Kalaupapa Airport, and Waimea-Kohala Airport. Effective 07/01/2050. Repeals 06/30/2014. (SD2)
Title
Airports Landing Fees; Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 665) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3354) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2915) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 03-19-12 1:20PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-12 1:16PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 303). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Hanohano, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-29-12 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Pine voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading. |