HI HB2772 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a translation and explanation of how to pronounce the state motto using modern Hawaiian orthography as displayed on the state seal on the official state website. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Seal.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 64). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Holt, Souza. |
2024-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-16-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3308 (Same As) 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.