HI HB2770 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates the principles of environmental justice and the precautionary principle into the environmental review process.
Title
Environmental Review Process; Environmental Justice; Precautionary Principle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2770&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2770_.HTM |