HI HB2767 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily modifies the Procurement Code for state construction projects. Sunsets December 31, 2015. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB2767 HD1)
Title
Procurement Code; State Construction Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 433-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Tokioka. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-02-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading |