HI HB2744 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the gun violence and violent crimes commission. Requires reports to the Legislature. Makes it a class C felony to purchase, manufacture, or otherwise obtain firearm parts for the purpose of assembling a firearm having no serial number. Amends certain requirements relating to firearms registration. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gun Violence Prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 423).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Har, Ohno excused (2).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-10HouseReconsideration of action taken on 07-06-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).
2020-07-06HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2020-07-02HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 562) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-06-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-02-20.
2020-06-30SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3729) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-06-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-22HouseRe-referred to JUD/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 48
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-05-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-19SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 119).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2020-02-19HouseReported from JUD/PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-06HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
2020-02-06HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Yamane, Thielen.
2020-02-04HouseBill re-scheduled as a proposed draft to be heard by JUD/PVM on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD/PVM on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-31HouseRe-referred to JUD/PVM, referral sheet 13
2020-01-27HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback