HI HB2743 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to implement standards consistent with federal regulations for the installation, operation, maintenance, and inspection of release prevention systems for all metal underground storage tanks and tank systems.
Title
Underground Storage Tanks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2743&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2743_.HTM |