HI HB27 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB27
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of groceries that are eligible under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) or Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children (WIC), regardless of the means of purchase and the SNAP or WIC eligibility of the purchaser. Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of nonprescription drugs.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB27 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Exemption
General Excise Tax
Groceries
Nonprescription Drugs
Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
General Excise Tax
Groceries
Nonprescription Drugs
Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=27&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB27_.HTM |