HI HB27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 081, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 081, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a voter to distribute or share an electronic or digital image of the voter's own marked ballot via social media or other means. Establishes that distributing or sharing the image of a voter's own marked ballot is not a defense for any election offenses or related offenses under the Penal Code. (SD1)
Title
Elections; Marked Ballot; Electronic or Digital Images
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 081, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 081, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182). |
2016-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 658). |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 632). |
2016-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-16. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K.Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392). |
2016-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 404) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3308) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 59). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Oshiro voting no (3) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McDermott. |
2016-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-26-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |